THE HUNSTANTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The U3A encourages education and research through members sharing their knowledge and talents freely with each other in informal learning interest groups. Through this self-help model, members contribute to a wide range of engaging and stimulating interest groups in am atmosphere of mutual support and companionship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacquie Yaxley | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Young | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Joan Eckersall | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Verity Jane Mitchell | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dawn Blenkinsop | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norman David Mitchell | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Linda Francis | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Elaine Thompson | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian John Holland | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.98k | £3.59k | £8.28k | £12.78k | £11.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.93k | £2.77k | £7.39k | £12.38k | £12.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE U3A ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodland House
Sandy Lane
Old Hunstanton
Norfolk
HUNSTANTON
Norfolk
- Phone:
- 07891459717
- Email:
- treasurer@hunstantonu3a.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window