Financial history ANDREW WINDSOR ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1181841
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.55k £78.08k £86.31k £97.22k £111.50k
Total expenditure £354.02k £94.40k £38.09k £75.03k £90.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A