Financial history TLC: TALK, LISTEN, CHANGE

Charity number: 512710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.96m £2.06m £3.15m £4.45m £4.33m
Total expenditure £1.95m £2.04m £3.06m £4.39m £4.27m
Income from government contracts £931.55k £713.18k £440.45k £2.42m £1.10m
Income from government grants £274.19k £85.61k £1.26m £26.14k £2.59m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.05k £57.00k £3.99k £2.11k £26.56k
Income - Other trading activities £43.43k £0 £64.44k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.91m £1.94m £3.08m £4.44m £4.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £147 £110 £167 £3.31k £27.92k
Income - Other £0 £66.05k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.95m £1.97m £3.06m £4.39m £4.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £7.72k £8.46k £10.61k £5.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £66.05k £0 £0 £0