SWANLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To use the Property, the trust funds and the income for the purposes of providing and maintaining the village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Swanland without distinction, including use for meetings, lectures and classes or other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare and for improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 October 2018: CIO registration
- 17 December 2021: Funds received from 1107061 SWANLAND VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Page | Chair | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barry Maddison | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Feetam | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mie Mie Kyaing | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Walker | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Walker | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Holmes | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Johns | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Evans | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Allan Quarterman | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Bowerman | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Christine Patricia Page | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.82k | £36.27k | £50.16k | £43.57k | £66.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.97k | £37.98k | £39.78k | £38.60k | £56.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.35k | £22.96k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2023 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2023 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 17 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO USE THE PROPERTY, THE TRUST FUNDS AND THE INCOME FOR THE PURPOSES OF PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SWANLAND, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swanland Village Hall
Main Street
Swanland
NORTH FERRIBY
HU14 3QR
- Phone:
- 07525798449
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window