ALL SAINTS NORTH CAVE CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial support for the prevention or relief of poverty, assist in the provision of recreation or leisure facilities, relieve sickness or preserve health, and advance the Christian religion for people living in East Yorkshire, and in particular in North Cave, South Cave and Everthorpe, all as more precisely defined in the charity constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN STANTON | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev BARRY WORSDALE | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CARTER | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.75k | £6.00k | £1.46k | £4.38k | £2.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £2.86k | £2.42k | £2.75k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
• THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND/OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE WHO ARE LIVING IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE VILLAGES OF NORTH CAVE, SOUTH CAVE AND EVERTHORPE (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS, GOODS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND/OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; • TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH INDIVIDUALS; • THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND • THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF, OR TOWARDS THE BUILDING OR RE-BUILDING COSTS, OF PLACES OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP TO IMPROVE FACILITIES TO PROVIDE SERVICES TO ENABLE BELIEVERS TO PRACTICE THEIR FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Middle Garth Drive
South Cave
BROUGH
HU15 2AY
- Phone:
- 01430422018
- Email:
- asboxcot@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window