Financial history SCAMPPS IN SURREY

Charity number: 1181248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.78k £19.25k £14.44k £32.89k £34.66k
Total expenditure £23.45k £19.12k £27.14k £31.74k £32.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A