CBA WEST MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CBA West Midlands is one of the regional groups of the Council for British Archaeology (CBA). It publishes West Midlands Archaeology annually, reporting on archaeological work in the region, organises Day Schools, including the yearly News from the Past, makes small grants for publication, research and training, responds to planning consultations and liaises with other amenity bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 26 August 1982: Standard registration
- CBA WEST MIDLANDS (Working name)
- COUNCIL FOR BRITISH ARCHAEOLOGY REGIONAL GROUP 8 (WEST MIDLANDS) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEENA PAYNE-LUNN | Chair | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Ramsey | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Marguerite Mosley | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.78k | £1.85k | £3.11k | £3.49k | £3.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.66k | £3.05k | £1.51k | £3.94k | £5.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 2 JULY 1994 AND 20 JUNE 1998. as amended on 13 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ARCHAEOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 MAYFIELD ROAD
WORCESTER
WR3 8NS
- Phone:
- 01905 721133
- Email:
- secretary.cbawm@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window