ABERYSTWYTH WHEELCHAIR BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sports club providing people with the opportunity to play wheelchair basketball.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 17 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL FRISBY | Chair | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
AIKATERINI STIVASARI | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
KARINA SHAW | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLLR DAVID WORRALL | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES SURGEY | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2020 | 03/04/2021 | 03/04/2022 | 03/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.86k | £35.59k | £52.79k | £38.64k | £19.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.72k | £8.28k | £52.29k | £34.23k | £39.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF WHEELCHAIR BASKETBALL IN MID AND WEST WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 6D
Cefn Llan Science Park
ABERYSTWYTH
Dyfed
SY23 3AH
- Phone:
- 07533075075
- Email:
- aberbasketball@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window