AMEN GOSPEL TABERNACLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We worship and praise our Lord Jesus Christ, we preach the gospel of faith in Jesus Christ to people of all background. As a church we provide support to our brethren in England and their families through prayers, counselling and small financial support. In addition, we do provide also support to disadvantage children and young people students with English and Maths tuition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUDIANDAMBU PAUL KANGABUKA | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nyemba Claudine Kandolo | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH NDIADIA MUDIANDAMBU | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £520 | £290 | £290 | £550 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £280 | £0 | £300 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 More Close
Canning Town
LONDON
E16 1JE
- Phone:
- 07946361743
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window