TRING LIONS CLUB (C IO)

Charity Number: 1181199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our activities include serving the local community & local organisations by either donating our time are by way of a grant. These organisations range from support to the elderly or local schools. We encourage people to serve thie community without personal reward. Grants are also made to international disaster relief. We operate mainly in and around the town of Tring.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £19,175
Total expenditure: £19,523

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandra Neil Chair 06 August 2024
None on record
Peter Block Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Penelope Jane Tregillus Trustee 02 August 2022
Aylesbury Vale Lions Club (CIO)
Received: On time
Michael John Claxton Trustee 03 August 2021
None on record
Michael Anthony Adams Trustee 17 December 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.08k £8.52k £18.80k £19.56k £19.18k
Total expenditure £18.12k £10.06k £16.35k £17.30k £19.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.24k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 16 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 08 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 15 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Fox Close
Wigginton
TRING
Hertfordshire
HP23 6ED
Phone:
01442 826512