FORGOTTEN FEET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a free footcare service to the homeless, vulnerable and socially isolated, and issue shoes and socks where needed. The service is free of charge and carried out by qualified, insured foothealth professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
210 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH SUSAN MONK BSc Hons | Chair | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Larry Moore | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Greenaway | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Constable BSc Hons | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA LONGHURST BSc Hons | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVE JAMES | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA SKYE PATTERSON | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.68k | £8.16k | £11.67k | £11.69k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.73k | £2.49k | £2.34k | £4.51k | £5.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 03 June 2022 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 03 June 2022 | 214 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD FOOT HEALTH BY IMPLEMENTING AND SUPPORTING A NETWORK OF FREE FOOT CARE CLINICS OPERATED BY QUALIFIED AND INSURED PROFESSIONALS ACROSS THE UK FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BUT WHO ARE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO ACCESS SUCH SERVICES, INCLUDING THE HOMELESS AND SOCIALLY ISOLATED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Church Road
Webheath
REDDITCH
Worcestershire
B97 5PG
- Phone:
- 07934317765
- Email:
- Forgottenfeetuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window