AL-SADAQAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works towards the relief of poverty, the advancement of education and relief of sickness of people living in any part of the world but mainly South-Asia by the provision of financial assistance, food, medical supplies and equipment, care shelter, education, clean water and assistance into employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 04 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PARVEEN HAROON | Chair | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ibrahim Umar Jawaad Rafique | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD BILAL AFRIDI | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £7.08k | £17.19k | £9.41k | £15.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £10.60k | £22.28k | £12.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 April 2023 | 444 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 April 2023 | 444 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2022 | 431 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2022 | 431 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BUT MAINLY SOUTH EAST ASIA BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, FOOD, MEDICAL AND EQUIPMENT SUPPLIES, CARE, SHELTER, EDUCATION, CLEAN WATER AND ASSISTANCE INTO EMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Oakleafe Gardens
ILFORD
IG6 1LQ
- Phone:
- 07575991356
- Email:
- BILALA@MEER-CO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window