THE I.T.S. FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1182080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Such general charitable purposes under the laws of England and Wales for the benefit of the public as the Trustees from time to time in their discretion think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £51,127
Total expenditure: £26,833

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IQBAL TAHERALLY SUTERWALLA Chair 06 February 2019
None on record
RASHIDA SUTERWALLA Trustee 06 February 2019
None on record
YASMIN IQBAL SUTERWALLA Trustee 06 February 2019
None on record
SHAZEEN IQBAL PERVEZ CHOGLEY Trustee 06 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.01m £12.88k £9.24k £26.36k £51.13k
Total expenditure £780 £4.45k £18.82k £8.28k £26.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.00m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £10.98k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £1.00m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £780 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £780 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 FRINGEWOOD CLOSE
NORTHWOOD
HA6 2TB
Phone:
07703501773
Website:

No information available