BOUNCE! BRIGHTER FUTURES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Devon based charity. We offer a range of therapeutic interventions in primary schools - including 1 to 1 psychotherapy/counselling for children, training and supervision for teachers, 1 to 1 counselling for parents and parenting development/support groups - all with the aim of developing the emotional health and wellbeing of children, families and school communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 24 January 2019: CIO registration
- BOUNCE! (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Peter Graham | Chair | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Hinds | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Balfour | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MS SAMANTHA JULIANNE SLATER | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.70k | £46.83k | £68.98k | £102.16k | £134.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.66k | £49.44k | £74.80k | £80.40k | £145.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Park Road
Tiverton
EX16 6AU
- Phone:
- 07807085791
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window