LOW HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hire out our building for social gatherings we also have a lot of social clubs ie bingo, luncheon club, karate easy line gym arts crafts cooking sessions for children and elderly, drama pantomime dance slimming world and CAB employability courses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £64,668 from 5 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 21 September 2018: CIO registration
- 09 November 2018: Funds received from 514271 LOW HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY ROBERT BLAKEWAY | Chair | 25 July 2005 |
|
|
||||
Mary Leach leach | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Rigby Bishop Rigy Bishop | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judy Meridith | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Enos Bayliss | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
stephanie tranter | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Johnson Woods | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ann daryl | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLY VICTORIA bott | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
STACEY JONES | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ERIC MARSTON | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN DOROTHY OWEN | Trustee | 31 July 1987 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.08k | £4.75k | £122.01k | £149.94k | £199.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.20k | £7.95k | £37.57k | £69.08k | £173.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.07k | N/A | £8.58k | £37.79k | £64.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LOW HILL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. THE ASSOCIATION WILL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOW HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
LOWHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE
KEMPTHORNE AVENUE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV10 9JJ
- Phone:
- 01902552312
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window