THE MAJID AL SADI CHARITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Jordan
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR MAJID ALAWI HUSSAIN ALSADI | Chair | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL IVEY | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
HER ROYAL HIGHNESS PRINCESS RAJWA BINT ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAYLA FAWZI MOHAMMAD ABDULLAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FARIS MAHMOOD NORI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS IN IRAQ, JORDAN, AUSTRALIA AND THE UK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FACILITATING INTERNATIONAL LINKS BETWEEN EDUCATION INSTITUTIONS IN THESE COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
7-11 Princes Gate
LONDON
SW7 1QL
- Phone:
- +96265826392
- Email:
- alex.ray@easternholding.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window