THE JOURNEY CHURCH MANCHESTER

Charity Number: 1183350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To work for the public benefit, to advance the Christian faith in such places and in such ways as the leadership and members see fit. To live out God's dream for our world. Living our faith out in Manchester and beyond.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £42,063
Total expenditure: £46,895

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Thomas Hawthorne Chair 21 March 2023
None on record
Dr Rachel Wangrangsimakul Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Nathan Harrison Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Richard Ashton Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
Alan Patrick Taylor Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £20.96k £14.96k £42.89k £42.06k
Total expenditure £13.55k £10.03k £38.11k £46.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 10 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 BEVERLY ROAD
MANCHESTER
M14 6TH
Phone:
07974155840