THE WILLIAM STOK ART CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in and to promote the arts for the public benefit, in particular but not exclusively by establishing and maintaining an art gallery, music centre, theatre and cinema and by providing arts facilities, public exhibitions, lectures and workshops and by encouraging high standards of art which increase the public's knowledge, understanding and appreciation of the arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALESSANDRO GRAZIANI | Chair | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSA MARIA LETTS | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA SUSAN BRADDELL-SMITH | Trustee | 30 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG GOURLEY | Trustee | 30 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
BICE BENVENUTO | Trustee | 03 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.73k | £2.21k | £2.42k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.88k | £1.76k | £2.12k | £609 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.20k | £1.35k | £1.10k | £400 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN ART GALLERY, MUSIC CENTRE, THEATRE AND CINEMA AND BY PROVIDING ARTS FACILITIES, PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND WORKSHOPS AND BY ENCOURAGING HIGH STANDARDS OF ART WHICH INCREASE THE PUBLIC'S KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 CONNAUGHT ROAD
LONDON
E11 4AB
- Phone:
- 02085568325
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window