GEORGE TOWNSEND CHARITY FOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS

Charity Number: 512753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of subsidised housing / accommodation for widows, spinsters and divorcees aged 45 or over, in Leicester & Leicestershire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,638
Total expenditure: £26,694

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 January 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Mark Simpson Chair 30 March 2020
LEICESTER AID IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF LEICESTER TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE GEORGE TOWNSEND CHARITY
Recently registered
Edward Guy Cufflin Trustee 30 March 2020
THE GEORGE TOWNSEND CHARITY
Recently registered
LEICESTER AID IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
THE KATE HOLLAND CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered
Denise Aaron Trustee 24 July 2017
THE GEORGE TOWNSEND CHARITY
Recently registered
Christopher Stuart Martin Mitchell Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record
Mrs D Taylor Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record
SIMON MORFORD GRAVETT Trustee 21 October 2013
THE GEORGE TOWNSEND CHARITY
Recently registered
LEICESTER AID IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
LEICESTERSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.84k £29.90k £24.01k £30.42k £41.64k
Total expenditure £33.45k £34.51k £21.77k £28.15k £26.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHARITY LINK
20A MILLSTONE LANE
LEICESTER
LE1 5JN
Phone:
0116 222 2200
Website:

No information available