LIVING A LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help people receiving care in their home (in the Vale of Glamorgan) do things they enjoy such as chess, gardening, listening to music, birdwatching or whatever they like to talk about or do. We do this by finding people who share their interests, likes and dislikes - 'Soulmates' - who can talk about and do things with them that they both like and enjoy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 18 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN GEOFFREY GAMGEE MBE | Chair | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Treharne Thomas | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela May Thomas | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
IRENE MAY HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAC JAMES BROWN | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 October 2023 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 October 2023 | 460 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1054 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2022 | 287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1419 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE RECEIVING DOMICILIARY CARE IN WALES AND WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PERSON CENTERED ACTIVITIES SO THAT LONELINESS AND ISOLATION ARE MINIMISED, AND QUALITY OF LIFE IS IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 EARL ROAD
PENARTH
CF64 3UN
- Phone:
- 07941785809
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window