INCLUSIVE INTERGENERATIONAL DANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
iID uses creativity, particularly dance to promote health, wellbeing and community cohesion. iID produces cross art form projects for people of all ages, but are specialists in working with older adults, to support people to develop their interests and skills through creative exploration while ensuring that every experience is high quality, person-centred, inclusive, safe and of artistic value.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £8,878 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Surrey
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 April 2019: CIO registration
- IID (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Dix | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael David Willans | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Lyall | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HO | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CUNDY | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.32k | £53.77k | £25.32k | £30.72k | £24.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.82k | £38.71k | £25.61k | £30.67k | £24.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.99k | £9.18k | £14.05k | £14.60k | £8.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHY RECREATION AND THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING INCLUSIVE INTERGENERATIONAL DANCE SESSIONS DESIGNED TO: 1)ENABLE PARTICIPANTS TO IMPROVE PHYSICAL MOBILITY AND STRENGTH; 2)RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PARTICIPANTS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AS A RESULT OF OLD AGE AND/OR ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL) AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF OLD AGE AND ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL)’.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lipgate Cottage
Kington Langley
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN15 5PA
- Phone:
- 07984791402
- Email:
- iidconsortium@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window