MUSICAL BOROUGHS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTES THE ARTS (AND MUSIC IN PARTICULAR) BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE, RAISING AWARENESS AND GRANTS FOR THE DELIVERY OF HIGH QUALITY MUSIC EDUCATION IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HAMMERSMITH & FULHAM, KENSINGTON & CHELSEA, AND WESTMINSTER.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- City Of Westminster
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 24 May 2019: CIO registration
- Tri-borough Music Trust (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Lynn Schmidt Whiddington CBE | Chair | 21 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Jonathan Charles Chambers | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Socorro Elena Torres-Duarte | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Milica Vukovic-Smart | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Susan Whiddington CBE | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Edward McGovern | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Catherine Marris | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Timothy Garrard | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Linlin Jin | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Eva Morrison | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
IAN MCLEAN ADAMS | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.91k | £1.46k | £32.48k | £79.18k | £53.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | £370 | £8.49k | £18.86k | £86.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THREE WEST LONDON BOROUGHS SUCH AS HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM; THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA; AND CITY OF WESTMINSTER AREA: (A) THE ARTS BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE, RAISING AWARENESS AND GRANTS FOR THE DELIVERY OF HIGH QUALITY MUSIC EDUCATION; AND (B) THE ARTS VOLUNTARY SECTOR BY PROMOTING COLLABORATIVE WORKING BY SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES (THAT ARE NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITIES) FOR THE HIGHEST QUALITY LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES IN MUSIC AND THE ARTS; AND (C) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRI-BOROUGH MUSIC HUB
LYRIC HAMMERSMITH
LYRIC SQUARE
KING STREET
LONDON
W6 0QL
- Phone:
- 07946489978
- Email:
- susan.whiddington@icloud.com
- Website:
-
triboroughmusichub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window