Trustees GURU ARJAN DEV GURDWARA SIKH TEMPLE DERBY
Charity number: 512762

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
pavendeep Singh | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keerat Singh Bains | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Shaminder kaur Lidher | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
manpreet singh mann | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaspal singh Nanuwan | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gurwinder Singh | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malkiat Singh | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jatinder SINGH | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
jaswant rattu | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kashmir Kaur | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
lehmber singh | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Major singh Sandhu | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
jagtar singh | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ravinder Singh | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
bhajan singh dhillon | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harwinder Singh | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
tejbir singh lidher | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
AJIT SINGH | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
NACHHATTAR SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.