BRITANNIA MARITIME AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Britannia Maritime Aid delivers maritime disaster relief and aid to devastated coastal communities. This is a new initiative to deliver British aid by British professionals in a British manned ship with a dual role to train the next generation of UK and Commonwealth seafarers. BMA needs support to cover initial costs - all contributions very welcome and will be acknowledged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Akrotiri
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Aruba
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Chile
- Christmas Island
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Fiji
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Greece
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- India
- Indonesia
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Liberia
- Libya
- Lithuania
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- New Caledonia
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Northern Mariana Islands
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Réunion
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Ukraine
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
Governance
- 27 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain KEVIN PETER SLADE MNM CMMar | Chair | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Askham FIMarEST | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Little | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mark Dickinson | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
viv Foster | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN ANN SIMPSON NEILSON | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIETER ARNO JAENICKE MNM | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Commander Jonathan Powis BSc RN | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN MALCOLM WALTER PARROTT FCILT FRIN | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.92k | £73 | £8.92k | £134 | £248 | |
|
Total expenditure | £198 | £336 | £9.16k | £2.47k | £339 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 27 FEB 2019 REGISTERED ON 27 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND SHALL BE CARRIED OUT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE, ARE: 1) THE RELIEF OF NEED BY THE PROVISION OF HUMANITARIAN/EMERGENCY/DISASTER AID. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN MARITIME, CONSTRUCTION AND MEDICAL SKILLS AND OTHER SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIVE MERIT DESIGNED TO DEVELOP AN INDIVIDUAL’S CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SERVICES.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 1
Oculus House
Lime Kiln Road
BRISTOL
BS1 5DN
- Phone:
- 07944895363
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window