THE OMEGA COURSE

Charity number: 1183642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We run The Omega Course - a safe and friendly space to talk about Death and Dying, so people develop confidence to think about their own end-of-life issues and to support friends and family to do the same. We free people to plan their bucket list and enjoy the life they have left to live, with the freedom of knowing when illness comes they have a plan. We also offer the course to professionals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,894
Total expenditure: £3,048

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALLEN BUSBY Trustee 08 March 2018
KENILWORTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY LEAMINGTON SPA
Received: On time
PHILIP SEWARDS MA, FIOD Trustee 08 March 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, KENILWORTH
Received: On time
ERICA JANE CORNWELL YOUNG Trustee 08 March 2018
None on record
BECKY DAWBER Trustee 08 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.47k £1.27k £405 £3.21k £1.89k
Total expenditure £2.52k £5.07k £627 £3.62k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £946 N/A N/A £2.18k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 ILAM PARK
KENILWORTH
CV8 2NU
Phone:
01926779285