Accounts and annual returns DEWSBURY WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1180430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 06 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 06 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 04 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 21 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 19 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 19 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 September 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 01 September 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window