LEICESTERSHIRE DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leicestershire Deaf Children's Society (LDCS) is affiliated to the National Deaf Children's Society (NDCS). We provide support on all aspects of deafness including communication, education, technology, social and behavioural and cultural issues. Membership is free. We provide social activities consisting of day and weekend trips, Christmas celebrations and youth activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 24 June 1982: Standard registration
- THE NATIONAL DEAF CHILDRENS SOCIETY LEICESTERSHIRE REGION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLENDA JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Daniel Bromley-Travis | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jasdeep Lad | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Chapman | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JAYNE FOUNTAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.38k | £901 | £597 | £751 | £742 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47k | £160 | £6 | £1.53k | £2.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 1982 as amended on 13 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE NATIONAL DEAF CHILDREN SOCIETY SO AS TO RELIEVE, EDUCATE AND ADVANCE IN LIFE DEAF AND HEARING-IMPAIRED CHILDREN, AND ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 DIDSBURY STREET
LEICESTER
LE3 1QP
- Phone:
- 07835318448
- Email:
- deaf_youth_club@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window