ASHTON IN MAKERFIELD AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work, by all means including associated activates conducive to learning and personal development, in Ashton in Makerfield and district and it's surrounding locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wigan
Governance
- 22 August 2018: Standard registration
- ASHTON IN MAKERFIELD & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Parsons | Chair | 16 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Peacock | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Shaw | Trustee | 16 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Byron | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Byron | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Campbell | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARY DAVIES | Trustee | 03 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.57k | £3.53k | £3.29k | £6.77k | £5.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.13k | £2.76k | £1.70k | £6.56k | £5.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAR 2018 as amended on 21 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN ASHTON IN MAKERFIELD & DISTRICT AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Coppice Drive
Billinge
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN5 7DX
- Phone:
- 07752451176
- Email:
- ainmu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window