THE LUXFORD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates a centre open Mon-Fri day time for the over 55s and retired in Uckfield and the surrounding areas including the organisation of various leisure and sporting activities, outings and providing low cost cooked meals. Low cost hiring in the evenings and weekends for social groups and the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 09 October 2018: CIO registration
- 16 December 2020: Funds received from 233601 THE LUXFORD CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Henry Macve | Chair | 09 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Roger Linthwaite | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Barbara Linthwaite Mrs | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Elizabeth Richards | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
June Mary Card | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
HORST-RAINER WORZ | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA RUBY RICHARDSON | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Eileen Wilcox | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Frank Burchett | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN EVANS | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.62k | £17.11k | £28.74k | £13.47k | £25.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.93k | £14.29k | £21.52k | £17.15k | £19.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.24k | £21.41k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2021 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2021 | 274 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE TOWN OF UCKFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Luxford Centre
Library Way
UCKFIELD
TN22 1AR
- Phone:
- 01825764287
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window