SALTASH TENNIS CENTRE

Charity Number: 1180248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a leisure facility for the use of ALL in the community to participate in tennis, including the provision of coaching with competitive opportunities. To advertise and promote the club with our governing body the LTA and working with other organisations, achieve growing participation within the wider community whilst ensuring that equity and equal opportunities are observed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £6,480
Total expenditure: £5,047

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 October 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • STC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL MADDEN Chair 09 October 2018
None on record
DAVID KNIGHT Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
JON JACOBS Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £34.30k £24.62k £6.20k £5.19k £6.48k
Total expenditure £7.42k £11.85k £3.57k £4.74k £5.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 19 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 06 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 06 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 17 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 09 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 09 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Chapel House
Pound Hill
Landrake
Saltash
PL12 5EN
Phone:
01752851403
Website:

saltashtenniscentre.co.uk (Site currently under construction)