Trustees EMPOWER YOUTH ZONES LTD
Charity number: 1179712

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE LOUISE WHITTAKER | Chair | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sean Turner | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee-Ann Igbon | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Kemp | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Christina Pepper | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Joyce Imelda Braddock | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MASRAFF | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Francis David Medlicott | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Kirszanek | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.