AL RISAALAH MOSQUE AND ISLINGTON ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Provide place of Worship - Provide educational support to children and adults - Youth activities - Advice and guidance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 2018: CIO registration
- 17 March 2020: Funds received from 1126329 SOMALI CULTURAL WATCH CENTRE
- ISLINGTON ISLAMIC CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YAZID MURSHID MOHAMED | Chair | 15 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||
MOHAMED DIRSHE | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||
ABDISAMAD ABDULLE | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||
ABDIRASAQ MUHAMED ADAN | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
HUSSEIN MOHAMUD OSMAN | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ABDIFATAH MOHAMED ADEN | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
HASSAN ABDULLAHI URUR | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ABDIKARIM HUSSEIN AHMED | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ABDISALAM HIRAD MOHAMED | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMED JAMA | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
HASHIM SHARIF MOHAMED | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ABDIRAZAK MOHAMUD TAKAR | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Dr ABDULQADIR AHMED-NUR | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.18k | £82.19k | £125.91k | £175.00k | £224.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.91k | £103.57k | £89.23k | £83.27k | £138.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SOMALIA SOLELY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS, ORGANISING SEMINARS, ORGANISING ESOL CLASSES, CITIZENSHIPS COURSES AND OTHER TRAININGS 3.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ANYWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SOMALIA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY Ò HEALTHCARE PROJECTS Ò WATER AND SANITATION PROJECTS Ò ALL OTHER NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP, RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, CARRYING OUT MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK 3.4 ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE SOLELY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al-Risaalah Mosque
91-93 Parkhurst Road
LONDON
N7 0LP
- Phone:
- 02077003733
- Email:
- info@al-risaalah.com
- Website:
-
info@al-risaalah.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window