QUERCUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees have a principal focus on support of a pre-eminent arboretum of the genus Quercus for the familiarisation and education of the public in oaks and of research into them. They also promote the protection of nature and especially of rare and endangered species of the oak genus. The Trustees use their income for these objects and may make grants to support others with similar objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 May 2019: Standard registration
- 03 April 2024: Funds received from 280863 M F HEATHCOAT AMORY CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD FITZGERALD HEATHCOAT AMORY | Chair | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Miles | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDERSON | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alice Mary Rose Thomson | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £11.77k | £38.10k | £19.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £117.49k | £28.52k | £32.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 August 2022 | 544 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARBORETUM CONTAINING A COLLECTION OF OAKS (GENUS QUERCUS); (B) SUPPORTING OR UNDERTAKING RESEARCH IN RELATION TO THE OAK GENUS IN ORDER TO SHARE KNOWLEDGE AND INCREASE THE SCIENTIFIC UNDERSTANDING OF THE OAK GENUS; (C) THE PUBLICATION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND RESOURCES, INCLUDING THE CATALOGUE OF THE OAKS AT THE ARBORETUM; 3.1.2 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PRESERVATION OF THE RARE AND ENDANGERED SPECIES OF THE OAK GENUS CONTAINED WITHIN THE ARBORETUM REFERRED TO IN CLAUSE 3.1.1; AND 3.1.3 TO ADVANCE SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chevithorne Barton
Chevithorne
Tiverton
Devon
EX16 7QB
- Phone:
- 01884 254899
- Email:
- info@chevithornebarton.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window