WORLD BHANGRA COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the World Bhangra Council are to advance the education of the public in Bhangra by promoting, sustaining and increasing knowledge and understanding of Bhangra through continued research and practice. Our success is based on active dialogue between artists and academics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Bahrain
- Belgium
- Canada
- China
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- El Salvador
- Finland
- France
- Hong Kong
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Kenya
- Mexico
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Pakistan
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Russia
- Scotland
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Thailand
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Venezuela
Governance
- 14 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARDEEP SINGH SAHOTA | Chair | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PERWINDER SAMRA | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MANDIP KAUR | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 23 February 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 February 2025 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 23 February 2025 | 384 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 April 2023 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 April 2023 | 424 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BHANGRA BY PROMOTING, SUSTAINING AND INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF BHANGRA THROUGH CONTINUED RESEARCH AND PRACTICE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE ART FORM OF BHANGRA AND ITS ASSOCIATED HERITAGE AND CULTURE THROUGH PERFORMANCE AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Thornfield Avenue
Lockwood
HUDDERSFIELD
HD4 5HG
- Phone:
- 07944536835
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window