TALK OUTSIDE OF THE SCRUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of this of the organisation is to raise awareness among all amateur rugby clubs and players (of both rugby codes, both genders and all ages) that mental illness is in and around us all and that someone opening up and discussing it is not a sign of weakness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 May 2019: CIO registration
- TOOTS (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ROBERT GRIFFIN | Chair | 10 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Vettorel | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Russell Mitchell | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Brown | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Garry Sides | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN DAVID JAMES GILBEY | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE PARKER | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.92k | £374 | |
|
Total expenditure | £721 | £396 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 May 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN THE SPORTS INDUSTRY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PSYCHO-SOCIAL SUPPORT TO PEOPLE THROUGH COUNSELLING, GROUP SUPPORT AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION ABOUT RELEVANT SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 STONY ROYD
FARSLEY
PUDSEY
LS28 5JA
- Phone:
- 07476313819
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window