Financial history BIRCHWOOD LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1179696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.87k £3.10k £8.00k £8.79k £13.59k
Total expenditure £10.27k £3.44k £6.80k £9.95k £10.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A