TRINITY LOVE BOX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 18 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARITA BARRY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RAYLICHIA DRENTHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SONAK SANDOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
QUEENETT SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF NEW PARENTS AND THEIR BABIES IN THE HULL AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING BOXES CONTAINING CLOTHING, NAPPIES, WIPES AND OTHER ESSENTIAL SUPPLIES BY:- - WORKING WITH LOCAL HOSPITALS TO IDENTIFY NEW PARENTS TO RECEIVE THESE BOXES WHO ARE IN NEED OF FREE SUPPLIES AND VULNERABLE; - WORKING WITH OTHER LOCAL BIRTHING CHARITIES TO IDENTIFY MOTHERS WHO HAVEN’T GIVEN BIRTH IN HOSPITALS TO RECEIVES THESE BOXES; AND - ACTING AS A CATALYST TO INCREASE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING TO IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR NEW PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN, IN THE HULL AND SURROUNDING AREAS; AND - TO SEEK AND CONSIDER ONGOING VIEWS OF THE RECIPIENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 DODTHORPE
HULL
HU6 9HA
- Phone:
- 07513698363
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window