NIKO NESTOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of children and young people particularly but not exclusively those who are financially disadvantaged throughout the world. Advancement of health and the saving of lives by provision of free swimming lessons, teaching and training in all aspects of water safety. Promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular the provision of facilities for swimming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Albania
- Armenia
- Austria
- Belarus
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Italy
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 29 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Nestor | Chair | 27 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Van Vooren | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zora Nestor | Trustee | 27 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Read | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev. Dr. Ann Jeffers | Trustee | 24 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elvira Dragas | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £250 | £250 | £250 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE FINANCIALLY DISADVANTAGED THROUGHOUT THE WORLD: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY THE PROVISION OF FREE SWIMMING LESSONS AND TEACHING AND TRAINING IN ALL ASPECTS OF WATER SAFETY. (2) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SWIMMING
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 BALFOUR GROVE
LONDON
N20 0SJ
- Phone:
- 07702257230
- Email:
- vjnestor@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window