SIKHS IN THE CITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SITC's main activities and objectives are the advancement of amateur sport and the advancement of health by encouraging and facilitating community participation in healthy recreation, in particular running. All events aim to provide racial / religious harmony through sport.The events are open to all regardless of age, disability,ethnic background,social class or gender and is open to nonmembers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARMANDER SINGH | Chair | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
SANDHYA JOBANPUTRA | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GHANAYA SINGH TALEWAR | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.84k | £9.12k | £12.37k | £10.87k | £27.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.18k | £7.29k | £8.21k | £11.77k | £12.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2024 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 August 2020 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 August 2020 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR RUNNING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 WELLESLEY ROAD
ILFORD
IG1 4JX
- Phone:
- 07958946868
- Email:
- info@sikhsinthecity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window