THE DOWNTON MEMORIAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide the running and maintenance of the Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £776 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 May 2019: CIO registration
- 14 December 2021: Funds received from 305507 DOWNTON MEMORIAL HALL
- DOWNTON MEMORIAL CENTRE (Working name)
- DOWNTON MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Kirsten Barnhurst-Davies | Chair | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Smith | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Giles | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Philip Mace | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Mace | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Parsons | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.78k | £28.38k | £18.16k | £24.75k | £37.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.47k | £16.15k | £27.41k | £18.86k | £24.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k | N/A | N/A | £776 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2024 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2024 | 282 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 December 2023 | 410 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 December 2023 | 410 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2022 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2022 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MEMORIAL CENTRE FOR USE OF INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF DOWNTON IN THE COUNTY OF WILTS AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION, AND (B) INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Long Close Barn
Long Close
Downton
SALISBURY
SP5 3HG
- Phone:
- 01725512963
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window