Financial history KEELBY VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 512808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.46k £28.78k £15.58k £23.08k £23.33k
Total expenditure £23.20k £10.92k £29.69k £18.84k £18.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £2.67k £4.11k