THE RECOVERY ADVOCATES AND CONSULTANTS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide free at the point of delivery services around substance misuse, providing advocacy and recovery coaching to the most marginalised and vulnerable individuals in our society. We give clients the opportunity to recovery and rediscover their life goals as well as providing them with a toolbox of health coping strategies to reduce the risk of relapse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 07 August 2019: CIO registration
- TRAC UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNALICE SIBLEY | Chair | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Michael Hunt | Trustee | 08 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Sergeant | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/08/2020 | 06/08/2021 | 06/08/2022 | 06/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £14.06k | £14.00k | £13.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | £12.01k | £12.10k | £9.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 August 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 August 2022 | 03 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2022 | 03 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADDICTION SUPPORT SERVICES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO INDEPENDENT ADVOCACY, ADVICE AND SOCIAL SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE TEES VALLEY WHO ARE RECOVERING OR TAKING STEPS INTO RECOVERY FROM ADDICTION. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 The Turnstile
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS5 6BY
- Phone:
- 07761933030
- Email:
- INFO@TRACUK.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window