THE STUART AND CHERRILYN KEOGH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance charitable activities in (but not exclusively) Newquay, Cornwall and surrounding areas, in particular by: 1.Making grants to support the improvement, maintenance or provision of public facilities, amenities and open spaces no longer being adequately provided by the relevant statutory authorities. 2.To advance appreciation of the arts by the provision of public works of art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 09 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Watts | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN CHARLES START | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHERRILYN KEOGH | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alexander | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £65.00k | £70.00k | £80.00k | £41.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £24 | £4.38k | £83.59k | £89.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 May 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN CORNWALL IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NEWQUAY AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING GRANTS TO SUPPORT THE IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC FACILITIES, AMENITIES AND OPEN SPACES THAT ARE NOT OR ARE NO LONGER BEING ADEQUATELY PROVIDED BY THE RELEVANT STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC WORKS OF ART.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRENWITH HOUSE
COMMONS ROAD
CUBERT
NEWQUAY
TR8 5HW
- Phone:
- 01637830864
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window