YOUNG AT HEART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young at Heart offers help and support to families of babies and children receiving treatment for a cardiac condition at the Birmingham Children's Hospital. We provide ward visits for families and work with the Heart Unit at the Birmingham Childrens Hospital. Our aim is to bring the families together at social events, where they can meet with other families, share experiences and make new friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 June 1982: Standard registration
- 22 November 2021: Funds received from 1171677 SOLIHULL HEART SUPPORT GROUP
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Donnelly Mrs | Chair | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Deana Bisson | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Roberts | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Welch | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
April Obinna | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toni Holmes | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Bruton | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Byrne Mrs | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Webster | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.68k | £2.03k | £56.33k | £65.86k | £71.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.91k | £8.59k | £35.78k | £50.03k | £62.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 11 JUNE 1982 AS AMENDED 7 JULY 1988 AND 20 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND OTHERS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM HEART DISEASE AND WHO ARE OR WHO MAY BECOME PATIENTS OF BIRMINGHAM CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lonsdale House
Suite 305a
52 Blucher Street
Birmingham
B1 1QU
- Phone:
- 07874801951
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window