YOUTH LINK NETWORKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collaborate with schools in Uganda to provide sanitary care to girl students to ensure that the school dropout rate will remain low by equipping the student & teachers with practical skills, materials & tools to make sanitary pads from the school & thus ensuring that they remain sustainable. Empowering the youth by training them in farming for nutrition & health benefits & economic generation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Jamaica
- Uganda
Governance
- 29 August 2019: CIO registration
- PRETTY BOX PROJECT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abosede Alaka | Chair | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chantelle Simpson | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rochelle Ampomah-Ababio | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charisma Jones | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karla Simpson | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Grossett | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/03/2020 | 29/03/2021 | 29/03/2022 | 29/03/2023 | 29/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.91k | £8.54k | £5.30k | £7.26k | £6.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £8.58k | £3.90k | £8.83k | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATION AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B)ADVANCING EDUCATION; C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
82 Parchmore Road
THORNTON HEATH
Surrey
CR7 8LW
- Phone:
- 07944205882
- Email:
- admin@youthlinknetworks.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window