MEDICS 4 RARE DISEASES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medics4RareDiseases is raising awareness of the relevance of rare disease to medical practice in order to relieve sickness of those living with rare diseases. This is achieved through events, learning resources, linking medical professionals with patients and advocates, competitions and creating/promoting other opportunities for medics in the field of rare diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £21,450 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Ghana
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 20 June 2019: Standard registration
- M4RD (Working name)
- Medics for Rare Disease (Working name)
- MEDICS 4 RARE DISEASES LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriet Gordon-Brown | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Russell Hearn | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sheela Updhyaya | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Macleod | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL CONRAD JEFFRIES | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS FRANCE | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.19k | £58.59k | £101.33k | £135.18k | £259.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.07k | £39.54k | £74.70k | £132.63k | £228.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 11 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM RARE DISEASES, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, BY: (A) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF MEDICS, ASSOCIATED PROFESSIONALS AND THE PUBLIC IN RARE DISEASES, GENETIC AND GENOMIC MEDICINE (B) PROMOTING RESEARCH IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO RARE DISEASES, GENETIC AND GENOMIC MEDICINE AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS (C) PROMOTING IMPROVED CARE AND TREATMENT OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM RARE DISEASES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Analogue Wonderland Ltd
12 Treadaway Tech Centre
Treadaway Hill
Loudwater
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckingh
- Phone:
- 01453933025
- Email:
- info@m4rd.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window