GROOVESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GrooveSchool provides opportunity to learn music production and DJ skills in an environment that promotes social inclusion and tackles inequality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 07 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES KAY | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Quinlan | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL VIDAL | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £9.73k | £30.69k | £38.26k | £39.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.46k | £30.64k | £32.47k | £29.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £9.07k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 December 2024 | 327 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 December 2024 | 327 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO MUSIC AND ARTS TECHNOLOGY; (B) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ÆSOCIALLY EXCLUDEDÆ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grooveschool
Youth Innovation Floor
3 Space International House
Canterbury Crescent
London
SW9 7QD
- Phone:
- 07577810285
- Email:
- info@grooveschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window