MIGHTY OAKS GATESHEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith for the public benefit in Gateshead and surrounding areas in accordance with the statement of faith. The relief of those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AUDREY WOOD | Chair | 04 February 2019 |
|
|||||
SAMUEL ALLPORT | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE JAMES CRICHTON | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN ROSE OLIVER | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.00k | £3.03k | £3.19k | £3.15k | £6.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.06k | £3.13k | £4.42k | £4.51k | £3.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
“TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN GATESHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREA IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH". "THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.” “SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Riversdale Close
Blackhall Mill
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE17 7LW
- Phone:
- 07866596759
- Email:
- ruth86666@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window