Trustees THRIVE MANCHESTER
Charity Number: 1183084

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Chilvers | Chair | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Hunter | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Caddick | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vinay Jalla | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Zain Ghumra | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Wilson | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hibberd | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Lopez | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.