AINTREE RACECOURSE CHARITABLE APPEAL TRUST

Charity number: 512833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision upkeep & maintenance of the Charitable Land as public open space & recreation or other leisure time occupation to improve the conditions of life of the general public. To advance the education of the general public in particular but not exclusively by the provision of an equestrian centre at which children and young people can be taught the benefit of horsemanship.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • A R C A T (Working name)
  • AINTREE RACECOURSE CHARITABLE APPEAL (Previous name)
  • AINTREE RACECOURSE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR CHARLES HENRY BARNETT Trustee 01 November 2016
None on record
DAVID CROFT MCDONNELL Trustee 07 September 2011
None on record
The Earl of Derby Trustee
THE GRENADIER GUARDS CHARITY
Received: On time
GRENADIER GUARDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
KNOWSLEY SAFARI FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 August 2024 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 August 2024 658 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2021 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Aintree Racecourse Co Ltd
The Aintree Centre
Ormskirk Road
Liverpool
L9 5AS
Phone:
01515222903
Website:

No information available